This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/10/2023 at 18:13:50 (UTC).

SETAI HOTEL ACQUISITION, LLC VS PLUMBING & AIR CONDITIONING PATROL, INC

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 SETAI HOTEL ACQUISITION, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PLUMBING AIR CONDITIONING PATROL, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SETAI HOTEL ACQUISITION, LLC

Defendant

PLUMBING & AIR CONDITIONING PATROL, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reiss, Allan S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/13/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/13/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

01/13/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/13/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/13/2023 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/19/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Filing:

02/20/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/28/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090106AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:REISS, ALLAN S.3350 MARY STMIAMI FL 33133-5215COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: PLUMBING & AIR CONDITIONING PATROL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170115AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:REISS, ALLAN S.3350 MARY STMIAMI FL 33133-5215COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/18/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less