This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/24/2023 at 11:21:09 (UTC).

SETAI HOTEL ACQUISITION LLC VS JVN HOLDINGS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 SETAI HOTEL ACQUISITION LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JVN HOLDINGS INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SETAI HOTEL ACQUISITION LLC

Defendants

JVN HOLDINGS INC

SETAI RESORT & RESIDENCES CONDOMINIUM ASSOC INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reiss, Allan S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

11/10/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/10/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/10/2021 - Request for Admissions

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Lis Pendens

11/12/2021 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

11/10/2021 - Complaint

Discharge/release of Lis Pendens

02/10/2022 - Discharge/release of Lis Pendens

Voluntary Dismissal

02/10/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Filing:

02/08/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

01/19/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Final Judgment

01/18/2022 - Motion for Final Judgment

Response to Request for Admissions

01/14/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice:

01/04/2022 - Notice:

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

01/04/2022 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Order of Default

01/04/2022 - Order of Default

Notice of Filing:

12/21/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

12/21/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Default

12/21/2021 - Motion for Default

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050074AMT PAID:$9.00NAME:REISS, ALLAN S.3350 MARY STMIAMI FL 33133-5215COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$9.00RECEIPT DATE:02/12/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Discharge/release of Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33022:3764; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33022:3691; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: JVN HOLDINGS INC; SETAI RESORT & RESIDENCES CONDOMINIUM ASSOC INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINITFFS MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: FEBRUARY 9, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970026AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:REISS, ALLAN S.3350 MARY STMIAMI FL 33133-5215COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:11/19/2021REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970083AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:REISS, ALLAN S.3350 MARY STMIAMI FL 33133-5215COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:11/13/2021REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32848:405; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less