This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/07/2021 at 09:23:06 (UTC).

SERGII FEDOROVYCH VS ADMIRA JANVIER

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 SERGII FEDOROVYCH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADMIRA JANVIER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fedorovych, Sergii

Defendant

Janvier, Admira

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lavent, Boris

Defendant Attorney

Bejamin L Bedard

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/08/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/08/2021 - Complaint

Email Notice:

09/08/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

09/08/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

09/08/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

09/08/2021 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/09/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

10/19/2021 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

10/20/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

10/20/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Unavailability/absence

10/20/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Answer and Affirmative Defense

11/04/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Interrogatory

11/04/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/04/2021 - Request for Production

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE_BLB@RRBPA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Janvier Admira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970124AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:LAVENT, BORIS 17295 NE 19TH AVENUE NORTH MIAMI FL 33162 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/10/2021 REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970003AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:LAVENT, BORIS 17295 NE 19TH AVENUE NORTH MIAMI FL 33162 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/10/2021 REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Janvier Admira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: BORIS@LAVENTLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEDARD, BENJAMIN LAWRENCE