This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/30/2022 at 03:10:11 (UTC).

SENTINEL HEALTH CARE AND REHAB CENTER LLC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 SENTINEL HEALTH CARE AND REHAB CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sentinel Health Care And Rehab Center Llc

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Assignee

Lamm, Mia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R Brian Boyd (esq)

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/27/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

09/27/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

09/27/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

09/27/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

09/27/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Filing:

09/27/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Email Notice:

09/27/2022 - Email Notice:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

10/03/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/03/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

10/06/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico Indemnity Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170428AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:R BRIAN BOYD (ESQ)8551 W SUNRISE BLVD STE 100MPLANTATION FL 33322-4007COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/04/2022REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Geico Indemnity Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150012AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:R BRIAN BOYD (ESQ)8551 W SUNRISE BLVD STE 100MPLANTATION FL 33322-4007COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:10/01/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sentinel Health Care And Rehab Center Llc, is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boyd, R Brian