This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/12/2023 at 06:37:46 (UTC).

SEMINOLE WELLNESS & INJURY CENTER, LLC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 SEMINOLE WELLNESS INJURY CENTER, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seminole Wellness & Injury Center, Llc

Assignor

Garcia, Alicia I

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

Defendant Attorney

Hanks, Brent D., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/09/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/09/2022 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

11/09/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

11/09/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

11/09/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

11/09/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

11/21/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/06/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

12/16/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

01/04/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

01/05/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110276AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/06/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130310AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:11/16/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less