This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 08:11:12 (UTC).

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC VS PETER DERGAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PETER DERGAN. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC

Defendants

DERGAN, PETER

DERGAN, ANA

ESTATE OF JOSE R MARTINEZ (DECEASED) THE

OVERBECK, BONNIE

DE LEON, ANA CECILIA

MARTINEZ, ANA MARIA

SUNSET HARBOUR HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC( THE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Knopp, Eric M.

Defendant Attorney

Robert Ariel Stiberman

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

01/25/2022 - Certificate of Mailing

Order Setting CM Deadline

01/24/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Certificate of Mailing

01/21/2022 - Certificate of Mailing

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

01/18/2022 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

Service Returned

01/14/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/14/2022 - Service Returned

Proof of Publication

01/11/2022 - Proof of Publication

Notice of Hearing-

01/03/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice:

12/23/2021 - Notice:

Lis Pendens

09/17/2021 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/16/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Certificate of Possession of Note

09/16/2021 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Notice:

09/16/2021 - Notice:

Complaint

09/16/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/16/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Mailing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Mailing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Denying Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JANUARY 18, 2022 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF ACTION ON ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS, CREDITORS, DEVISEES, BENEFICIARIES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHERS PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF JOSE R. MARTINEZ A/K/A JOSE MARTINEZ BONILLA, DECEASED. PUB DATE 2/3/2022 WITH 1 MAIL OUT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DE LEON ANA CECILIA

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010056AMT PAID:$922.50NAME:KNOPP, ERIC M.8201 PETERS RD STE 3000PLANTATION FL 33324-3292COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$7.50$7.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$922.50RECEIPT DATE:09/18/2021REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32756:1800; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PREVIOUS FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE SUNSET HARBOUR HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Ariel Stiberman