This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:16:52 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC VS BELKYS ARANGO CARMONA

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BELKYS ARANGO CARMONA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Second Round Sub, Llc

Defendant

Carmona, Belkys Arango

Hialeah, FL 33010-5071

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/20/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/20/2022 - Statement of Claim

SP Pretrial Date

02/16/2023 - SP Pretrial Date

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640017AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/21/2023REGISTER#:264CASHIER:E401479

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Carmona Belkys Arango

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040064AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:JUAN G ANDREU1000 NW 57TH CT STE 400MIAMI FL 33126-3292COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:12/24/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $3,981.42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less