This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/30/2022 at 02:28:54 (UTC).

SEBASTIAN CASTELLI, PA VS USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 SEBASTIAN CASTELLI, PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sebastian Castelli, PA

Defendant

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greene, Travis

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/15/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/15/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/02/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Voluntary Dismissal

06/16/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33248:961; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160115AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2870094AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:04/16/2022REGISTER#:287CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greene, Travis