This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/26/2022 at 00:35:41 (UTC).

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY VS JMT PETROLEUM VENTURES CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JMT PETROLEUM VENTURES CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

JMT PETROLEUM VENTURES CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Proulx, Joseph Charles

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/29/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/29/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/30/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

01/21/2022 - Service Returned

Order Setting CM Deadline

02/08/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice:

02/28/2022 - Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JMT PETROLEUM VENTURES CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2950037AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PROULX, JOSEPH CHARLES201 N ARMENIA AVETAMPA FL 33609-2303COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/31/2021REGISTER#:295CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2950008AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:PROULX, JOSEPH CHARLES201 N ARMENIA AVETAMPA FL 33609-2303COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:12/31/2021REGISTER#:295CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: JMT PETROLEUM VENTURES CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $25,803.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROULX, JOSEPH C