This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 03:40:07 (UTC).

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY VS IMPACT DESIGN SOLUTIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against IMPACT DESIGN SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scottsdale Insurance Company

TISW CORP

Defendant

Impact Design Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Webb, Thomas Daniel

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/15/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/15/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/16/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/23/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: Impact Design Solutions Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090136AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:WEBB, THOMAS DANIEL4309 SALISBURY RDJACKSONVILLE FL 32216-6123COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/17/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090100AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:WEBB, THOMAS DANIEL4309 SALISBURY RDJACKSONVILLE FL 32216-6123COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/17/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Webb, Thomas Daniel