This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 05:12:24 (UTC).

SCOTT ABRAHAM VS GREGORY J. RITTER (PR) ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 SCOTT ABRAHAM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GREGORY J RITTER PR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abraham, Scott

Miami Glamour

Defendants

Ecker (Co Tr & Beneficiary), Ellen Berkson

Berkson (Co Tr & Beneficiary), Robert E.

Stoll (Co Tr & Beneficary), Lori Berkson

Venetian International LLC

Ritter (Pr), Gregory J.

Bosch, Luis

Estate of Marshall H. Berkson (The)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory J Ritter

Fell, Brian David

Chase, Kenneth

Scolaro, Timothy Robert

Shapiro, Craig B

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

11/24/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Mediators Report

11/24/2021 - Mediators Report

Amended Complaint

11/08/2021 - Amended Complaint

Notice of Mediation Conference

11/04/2021 - Notice of Mediation Conference

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

10/29/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

10/29/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Motion to Dismiss

10/26/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Response to Motion

10/26/2021 - Response to Motion

Notice of Hearing-

10/26/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Response to Motion

10/26/2021 - Response to Motion

Response to Motion

10/26/2021 - Response to Motion

Notice of Filing:

10/25/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Protective Order

10/25/2021 - Motion for Protective Order

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

10/25/2021 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Taking Deposition

10/22/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion for Sanctions

10/21/2021 - Motion for Sanctions

Response to Request for Production

10/21/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Motion to Compel

10/21/2021 - Motion to Compel

137 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32873:3898; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: Ritter (Pr) Gregory J.; Berkson (Co Tr & Beneficiary) Robert E.; Ecker (Co Tr & Beneficiary) Ellen Berkson; Stoll (Co Tr & Beneficary) Lori Berkson; Estate of Marshall H. Berkson (The); Bosch Luis; Venetian International LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediators Report; Event Type: Event; Comments: REPORT OF MEDIATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Mediation Conference; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 4:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: BOSCH AND VENETIAN'S MOTION TO STAYOBJECTION TO FURTHER DISCOVERY; BOSCH AND VENETIAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS IV, V AND VI OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND RITTER ET AL. MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
145 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600042AMT PAID:$406.00NAME:CHASE, KENNETHCHASE LAW LLC 1509 16TH STREET NW, SUITE 500WASHINGTON DC 20036COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$406.00RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2021REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less