This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/15/2021 at 03:36:03 (UTC).

SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY, LLC ET AL VS ROADWAY INC.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ROADWAY INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Schumacher Automotive Delray, LLC

Shumacher Auto Group Inc

Defendant

Roadway Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Lemoine

Defendant Attorney

Benitez, Leo

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

01/12/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

01/12/2021 - Response to Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

12/08/2020 - Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

11/05/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Amended Complaint

10/05/2020 - Amended Complaint

Motion to Dismiss

10/05/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

10/05/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

10/05/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/05/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

10/05/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/05/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Service of Process

10/02/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/24/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/22/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Filing:

09/22/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

09/22/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Interrogatory

09/21/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

09/21/2020 - Request for Production

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Benitez Leo; Roadway Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Benitez Leo; Roadway Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Roadway Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2700054AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:KENNETH LEMOINE 1801 INDIAN RD STE 100 WEST PALM BEACH FL 33409-4604 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/24/2020 REGISTER#:270CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660230AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:KENNETH LEMOINE 1801 INDIAN RD STE 100 WEST PALM BEACH FL 33409-4604 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/23/2020 REGISTER#:266CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CORRESPONDENCE REF: 2018 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE TRACKHAWK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schumacher Automotive Delray, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Roadway, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEO BENITEZ