This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/25/2021 at 17:47:49 (UTC).

SCHRIER FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 SCHRIER FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHRIER FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC

Assignor

Direda, Franco

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

La Montagne, Rachel

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/03/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

03/03/2020 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

03/13/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Affidavit of Lost Instrument

05/20/2020 - Affidavit of Lost Instrument

Pre Trial Summons

05/27/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Service of Process

08/04/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

08/12/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

08/13/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion for Extension of Time

09/03/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

09/03/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Voluntary Dismissal

10/26/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32167:1990; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Caleb Courtroom 2-2 5400 N.W. 22nd Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2030101AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Lost Instrument; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Caleb Courtroom 2-2 5400 N.W. 22nd Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3320015AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/13/2020 REGISTER#:332CASHIER:MAXI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3640020AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHRIER FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O JOHN FINEO is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer La Montagne, Rachel