This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/10/2020 at 04:40:54 (UTC).

SAUL, CARLOS VS WALP, KATHRYN

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 SAUL, CARLOS filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against WALP, KATHRYN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************H-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Saul, Carlos

Florida Pace Centers

Respondent

Walp, Kathryn

Not Classified By Court

NEDA PICURIC, DO

ENRIQUE SUAREZ, PHD

ESTHER FELDMAN, PHD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Litwin, Avi J

Respondent Attorney

REGIONAL COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Determination of Capacity; Hearing Code: DC; Hearing Time: 9:50AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Ordr Determ Inc & Appt Plen Guardian; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Determination of Capacity; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: R/S FROM 3/19/2020 CORONAVIRUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: DR REPORT FAXED TO PETT ATT & RC3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESET NOTICE FAXED AND MAILED TO ALL INTERESTED PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Formal Notice by Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLENARY PICURIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: PICURIC PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: DR. ESTHER FELDMAN-LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: PACKAGE SENT TO G.P.D.C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: PACKAGE FAXED TO COMMITTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE FAXED AND MAILED TO ATTORNEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice and Order Regarding Petition to Determine Incapacity; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Formal Notice by Mail; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice and Order Regarding Petition to Determine Incapacity; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450015AMT PAID:$232.00 NAME:LITWIN, AVI J 4434 SHERIDAN AVE MIAMI BEACH FL 33140-3143 COMMENT:CONFIDENTIAL CASE IN ODYSSEY ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3418-MH FILING FEE1$232.00$232.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition to Determine Competency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.