This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/11/2021 at 10:44:36 (UTC).

SARAH BUNTS ET AL VS AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 SARAH BUNTS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUNTS, SARAH

BUNTS, BRENDAN

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor M Llerandi

Defendant Attorney

Scolaro, Timothy Robert

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/19/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/19/2021 - Complaint

Request for Production

01/21/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/21/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

01/21/2021 - Email Notice:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

02/04/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Amended Notice

03/11/2021 - Amended Notice

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/10/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/18/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion for Extension of Time

06/18/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Privilege Log

07/07/2021 - Privilege Log

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/07/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Production

07/07/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/07/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570209AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:VICTOR M LLERANDI 5901 SW 74TH ST STE 300 SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5176 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/22/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560138AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:VICTOR M LLERANDI 5901 SW 74TH ST STE 300 SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5176 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/21/2021 REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less