This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/16/2022 at 19:16:12 (UTC).

SARA GONZALEZ VS PEDRO P BOSCH, M.D. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 SARA GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PEDRO P BOSCH, M D. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ, SARA

Defendants

BOSCH, M.D., PEDRO P

LORA, M.D., FERNANDO

CGH HOSPITAL, LTD

ISAAC, M.D., GUSTAVO

LANCET, FREDERICK

Palmetto Pathology Services, PA

Vital Medical Center

ABATE MEDICAL EMERGENCIES NOW, INC.

TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION

CORAL GABLES HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timmons, Natalia

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability/absence

03/07/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Unavailability/absence

02/18/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion to Dismiss

02/18/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

02/18/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Request for Production

02/17/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/17/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

02/17/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

02/16/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

02/16/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/04/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

12/23/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/23/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2910018AMT PAID:$411.00NAME:TIMMONS, NATALIA8492 SW 8 STMIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$411.00RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2021REGISTER#:291CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Palmetto Pathology Services, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CGH HOSPITAL, LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where CORAL GABLES HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenet Health Care Corporation is a litigant