This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/24/2020 at 08:05:39 (UTC).

SANDOVAL, EILEEN VS TORRES, ALBERTO

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 SANDOVAL, EILEEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TORRES, ALBERTO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sandoval, Eileen

Respondent

Torres, Alberto

Minor

Torres, Ashley Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Appear; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3-24-20 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Non-Jury Trial; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3-24-20 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Case Management Conference; Hearing Code: CMC; Hearing Time: 4:00PM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 28-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Conference; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Case Management Conference; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3-3-20 4:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Torres Alberto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Birth Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Sandoval Eileen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Issued for Sheriff Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610002AMT PAID:$459.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3340-SHERIFF - DADE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at South Dade; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.