This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/07/2021 at 06:10:26 (UTC).

SAMANTHA HALL VS LUIS E VELAZQUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 SAMANTHA HALL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS E VELAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALL, SAMANTHA

Defendants

EAST-WEST GF, LLC

VELAZQUEZ, LUIS E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Montero, Andres G

Defendant Attorney

Corkran, Christopher T

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for Dismissal

10/19/2021 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Cancellation Notice

09/08/2021 - Cancellation Notice

Certificate of No Objections to Production

07/19/2021 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

Witness List

07/06/2021 - Witness List

Notice of Compliance

07/02/2021 - Notice of Compliance

Request for Copies

06/30/2021 - Request for Copies

Certificate of No Objections to Production

05/26/2021 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

Request for Copies

05/26/2021 - Request for Copies

Request for Copies

05/14/2021 - Request for Copies

Response to Request for Production

05/11/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

04/12/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

04/12/2021 - Privilege Log

Order Extending Time for

03/31/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Order Extending Time for

03/18/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Hearing-

03/11/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Interrogatory

02/23/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/15/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/15/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32806:1723; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VELAZQUEZ LUIS E; EAST-WEST GF LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF COMPULSORY PHYSICAL EXAMINATION WITH DR. RAFAEL FERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: COMMENCING 03-07-2022. CALENDAR CALL ON 02-25-2022 AT 8AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: EAST-WEST GF LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2680352AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MONTERO, ANDRES G 351 NW 42ND AVE STE 202 MIAMI FL 33126-5670 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/15/2020 REGISTER#:268CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST & WEST GOURMET FOOD INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corkran, Christopher T., ESQ.