This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/29/2021 at 19:45:21 (UTC).

SALTWATER USA, INC. VS PACIFIC SEAFOOD CO.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 SALTWATER USA, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PACIFIC SEAFOOD CO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALTWATER USA, INC.

Defendant

PACIFIC SEAFOOD CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gastesi, Raul

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/01/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

10/01/2020 - Complaint

(A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/06/2020 - (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/07/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

11/04/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

11/10/2020 - Service Returned

FWOP Notice

10/19/2021 - FWOP Notice

Voluntary Dismissal

10/20/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

10/20/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: FWOP; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32805:3333; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PACIFIC SEAFOOD CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: FWOP Notice; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PACIFIC SEAFOOD CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2760077AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GASTESI, RAUL8105 NW 155TH STMIAMI LAKES FL 33016-5872COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/07/2020REGISTER#:276CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2730066AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:GASTESI, RAUL8105 NW 155TH STMIAMI LAKES FL 33016-5872COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:10/03/2020REGISTER#:273CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less