This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/05/2020 at 22:53:29 (UTC).

SABRINA WRIGHT JONES VS. HERIBERT AMERTIS

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 SABRINA WRIGHT JONES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERIBERT AMERTIS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRIGHT JONES, SABRINA

Defendant

AMERTIS, HERIBERT

 

Court Documents

Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

06/17/2020 - Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

Service Returned

02/21/2020 - Service Returned

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Pre Trial Summons

02/14/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/14/2020 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Mediation; Hearing Code: MEDIATE; Hearing Time: 11:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediation; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Referral to Mediation Unit; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 20, 2020 AT 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080007AMT PAID:$310.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:TENDER AMT:$310.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Hialeah; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.