This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 11:46:07 (UTC).

S. VIROJA, P.A. VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 S VIROJA, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S. Viroja, P.A.

Assignor

Gabriel, Naima

Defendant

Windhaven Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Nanes, Tamara, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

10/09/2019 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

11/13/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Demand for Jury Trial

12/09/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Appearance

12/09/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/06/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process

01/07/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Filing:

01/09/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

01/22/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Memorandum of Disposition

01/27/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Placing Case On Inactive Status - Other Reason

01/28/2020 - Order Placing Case On Inactive Status - Other Reason

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Placing Case On Inactive Status - Other Reason; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN RECEIVERSHIP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUPPORTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH EXCEPTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2140002AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM 5005 LEJEUNE ROAD HIALEAH FL 33013 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Windhaven Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3630016AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM 5005 LEJEUNE ROAD HIALEAH FL 33013 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Windhaven Insurance Company is a litigant