This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/06/2020 at 00:17:00 (UTC).

S. VIROJA, P.A. VS OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 S VIROJA, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S. Viroja, P.A.

Assignor

Mentor, Frantz

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Mikiciuk, Michael, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

10/09/2019 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

11/13/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/02/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Admissions

01/02/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/06/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process

01/07/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

01/07/2020 - Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

Reply

01/07/2020 - Reply

Request for Production

01/08/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/08/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/08/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Admissions

01/16/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

01/21/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Memorandum of Disposition

01/27/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Trial (case at Issue); Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH EXCEPTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170002AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM 5005 LEJEUNE ROAD HIALEAH FL 33013 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3630015AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM 5005 LEJEUNE ROAD HIALEAH FL 33013 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant