This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 19:53:49 (UTC).

S AND A PROPERTY INVESTMENT SERVICES LLC VS PEDRO J. GARCIA, MIAMI DADE CTY PROPERTY APPRAISER ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 S AND A PROPERTY INVESTMENT SERVICES LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA, MIAMI DADE CTY PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S AND A PROPERTY INVESTMENT SERVICES LLC

Defendants

PEDRO J. GARCIA, MIAMI DADE CTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

PETER CAM, MIAMI DADE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

JIM ZINGALE, EXEC DIR DEPT OF REV., STATE OF FL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stanley H. Beck

Defendant Attorneys

Lifshitz, Daija Page

Sandrea-Rivero, Franklin D.

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment by Judge

04/26/2022 - Final Judgment by Judge

Voluntary Dismissal

04/22/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Summary Final Judgment

04/19/2022 - Summary Final Judgment

Notice:

04/14/2022 - Notice:

Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

04/19/2022 - Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

Notice of Appearance

04/18/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Response:

04/13/2022 - Response:

Notice:

04/12/2022 - Notice:

Notice of Filing:

04/06/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Response:

04/06/2022 - Response:

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

03/29/2022 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Motion for Summary Judgment

03/28/2022 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Filing:

03/28/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Witness and Exhibit List

03/14/2022 - Witness and Exhibit List

Witness List

03/14/2022 - Witness List

Witness and Exhibit List

03/14/2022 - Witness and Exhibit List

Affidavit of:

03/09/2022 - Affidavit of:

Notice of Filing:

03/09/2022 - Notice of Filing:

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/26/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: FINAL JUDGMENT IS IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANT. SEE ORDER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 33157:4043; Event Type: Event; Comments: FINAL JUDGMENT IS IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANTS. SEE ORDER. Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA MIAMI DADE CTY PROPERTY APPRAISER; PETER CAM MIAMI DADE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR; JIM ZINGALE EXEC DIR DEPT OF REV. STATE OF FL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33157:2869; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA MIAMI DADE CTY PROPERTY APPRAISER; PETER CAM MIAMI DADE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR; JIM ZINGALE EXEC DIR DEPT OF REV. STATE OF FL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Summary Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33142:257; Event Type: Event; Comments: FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AS TO COUNT II

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Referral to Mediation Unit; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022

HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: AMENDED S AND A PROPERTY INVESTMENT SERVICES LLCS MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT AS TO COUNT II OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND PROPERTY APPRAISER AND TAX COLLECTOR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT II, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT II, AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
07/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA MIAMI DADE CTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: PETER CAM MIAMI DADE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990227AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:STANLEY H. BECK1484 E HALLANDALE BEACH BLVDHALLANDALE FL 33009-4617COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:07/30/2021REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990188AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:STANLEY H. BECK1484 E HALLANDALE BEACH BLVDHALLANDALE FL 33009-4617COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/30/2021REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less