This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/11/2023 at 23:37:20 (UTC).

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC. VS SUBIRANA TRANSPORT INC.

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SUBIRANA TRANSPORT INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC.

RYDER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES

Defendant

SUBIRANA TRANSPORT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berstein, Michael I, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/03/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

10/03/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/06/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/12/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090067AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BERSTEIN, MICHAEL I, ESQ3050 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 403MIAMI FL 33137-4143COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/13/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: SUBIRANA TRANSPORT INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180193AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BERSTEIN, MICHAEL I, ESQ3050 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 403MIAMI FL 33137-4143COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:10/06/2022REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RYDERS TRANSPORTATION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where RYDER TRUCK RENTAL LT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berstein, Michael I, ESQ