This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/27/2020 at 06:53:52 (UTC).

RUBEN GONZALEZ VS MB MEDICAL TRANSPORT LLC.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 RUBEN GONZALEZ filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MB MEDICAL TRANSPORT LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez, Ruben

Defendant

MB MEDICAL TRANSPORT LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony M Georges-Pierre

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover

12/27/2019 - Civil Cover

Complaint

12/27/2019 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/13/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/13/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

03/03/2020 - Service Returned

Motion:

04/06/2020 - Motion:

Order Extending Time for

04/10/2020 - Order Extending Time for

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/06/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/06/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response:

05/19/2020 - Response:

Notice of Filing:

07/31/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Witness List

08/19/2020 - Witness List

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY REQUESTS ON DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S DENIAL OF DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MB MEDICAL TRANSPORT LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560164AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130-6807 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MB MEDICAL TRANSPORT LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430291AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130-6807 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE, ESQ