This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/05/2020 at 15:13:08 (UTC).

RUBAL FINANCIAL & INVESTMENT LLC VS RICHARD AND SON SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 RUBAL FINANCIAL INVESTMENT LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RICHARD AND SON SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rubal Financial & Investment LLC

Defendant

RICHARD AND SON SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Banos, Javier

Defendant Attorney

Fuentes, Milton

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

02/05/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/21/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

12/23/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Unavailability/absence

12/23/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Service Returned

11/27/2019 - Service Returned

Service Returned

11/27/2019 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

11/18/2019 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

Civil Cover

11/18/2019 - Civil Cover

Lis Pendens

11/18/2019 - Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31816:1671; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Fuentes Milton; RICHARD AND SON SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Fuentes Milton; RICHARD AND SON SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2740010AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$60.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/22/2019 REGISTER#:274CASHIER:CWILLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RICHARD AND SON SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600272AMT PAID:$406.00 NAME:BANOS, JAVIER 3126 CORAL WAY MIAMI FL 33145-3210 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31701:3093; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.