Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/03/2021 at 02:07:59 (UTC).

RTO NATIONAL LLC VS ARELI DIAZ

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 RTO NATIONAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARELI DIAZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RTO NATIONAL LLC

Defendant

DIAZ, ARELI

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment by Judge

03/09/2021 - Final Judgment by Judge

Memorandum of Disposition

03/08/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Service Returned

02/04/2021 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

01/07/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Complaint

01/07/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAILED TO ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 32391:3596; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060084AMT PAID:$395.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$395.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/11/2021 REGISTER#:206CASHIER:FERGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DIAZ ARELI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RTO NATIONAL LLC is a litigant