This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/21/2021 at 06:54:27 (UTC).

ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. VS BIANCHI & CECCHI SERVICE, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against BIANCHI CECCHI SERVICE, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.

Defendants

BIANCHI & CECCHI SERVICE, LLC

NAVALIMPIANTI USA, INC.

TECNIMPIANTI SPA

NAVALIMPIANTI SPA

BC SERVICE, TECNIMPIANTI SPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gutwein, Evan Seth

Defendant Attorney

Michael C Rotunno

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/19/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/19/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Waiver:

07/07/2021 - Waiver:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Amended Complaint

06/23/2021 - Amended Complaint

Complaint

06/10/2021 - Complaint

AgreedOrder

10/07/2021 - AgreedOrder

Notice:

09/30/2021 - Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

09/27/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Production

09/22/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

09/21/2021 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Request for Hearing

09/21/2021 - Request for Hearing

Motion to Dismiss

08/30/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Quash

08/27/2021 - Motion to Quash

Motion to Dismiss

08/19/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. SEE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS VIA THE HAGUE CONVENTION Parties: Gutwein Evan Seth; ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11-05-2021 AT 9:30 AM, IN ROOM VIRTUAL COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Quash; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gutwein Evan Seth; Michael C Rotunno; TECNIMPIANTI SPA; NAVALIMPIANTI SPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Michael C Rotunno; NAVALIMPIANTI USA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120048AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:GUTWEIN, EVAN SETH 150 SE 2ND AVE STE 1200 MIAMI FL 33131-1579 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/30/2021 REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100324AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:GUTWEIN, EVAN SETH 150 SE 2ND AVE STE 1200 MIAMI FL 33131-1579 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/29/2021 REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550256AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:GUTWEIN, EVAN SETH 150 SE 2ND AVE STE 1200 MIAMI FL 33131-1579 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/12/2021 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD., A foreign corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C Rotunno