This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/23/2022 at 06:02:06 (UTC).

ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, INC. VS PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rose Radiology Centers, Inc.

Assignor

Garfole, Mary

Defendant

Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

Defendant Attorney

Kay, Rebecca Cooperman

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

09/22/2022 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

09/22/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

09/22/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

09/22/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

09/22/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

09/26/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/11/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

11/02/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Demand for Jury Trial

11/07/2022 - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Filing:

11/07/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Appearance

11/07/2022 - Notice of Appearance

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160483AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/13/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150407AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:09/24/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Estevez, Marisol