This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 14:18:37 (UTC).

ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, INC. VS FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rose Radiology Centers, Inc.

Assignor

Adams, Michael J

Defendant

Farmers Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/05/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/05/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

01/05/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/05/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

01/05/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

01/05/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/09/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/13/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/17/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Farmers Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120114AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/14/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180047AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/07/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less