This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/11/2020 at 23:00:26 (UTC).

ROLDAN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC VS SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 ROLDAN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROLDAN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zincone, Francesco Antonio, III

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/14/2020 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/20/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/20/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Extension of Time

10/29/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Extending Time for

11/20/2020 - Order Extending Time for

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVING THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ROLDAN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550111AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:ZINCONE, FRANCESCO ANTONIO, III 4960 S.W. 72 AVENUE SUITE 206 MIAMI FL 33155 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590190AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ZINCONE, FRANCESCO ANTONIO, III 4960 S.W. 72 AVENUE SUITE 206 MIAMI FL 33155 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANCESCO ZINCONE