This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/09/2019 19:34:37

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 ROJAS, MILDRED filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR J. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details

  • Case Number *************C-04
  • Filing Date 10/10/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Florida Dade Court System
  • Courthouse Miami-Dade County Courthouse
  • County Miami-Dade
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Respondent RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR J
  • Petitioner ROJAS, MILDRED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • Answer to Counter Petition; Event Type: Event
  • 12/02/2019
  • Certificate of Compliance With Mandatory Disclosure; Event Type: Event
  • 11/22/2019
  • AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING PETITIONER SOLE EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION
  • 11/22/2019
  • Special Appointment; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: EMERGENCY MTN FOR EXCLUSIVE USE
  • 11/20/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480010AMT PAID:$295.00 NAME:HANNAN, MARTIN L. 9370 SW 72ND ST STE A266 MIAMI FL 33173-5453 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3303-COUNTER PETITION1$295.00$295.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$295.00
  • 11/18/2019
  • Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11-22-19 8:30AM
  • 11/18/2019
  • Answer and Counter Petitions; Event Type: Event
  • 11/14/2019
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 1 HR SPECIALLY SET, EMERGENCY MTN FOR USE OF HOME
  • 11/14/2019
  • Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/26/2019 @ 0900
  • 10/30/2019
  • Return of Service Served; Event Type: Event; Comments: HECTOR J RODRIGUEZ OCTOBER 29 2019
  • 10/29/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3590082AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MUNIZ, CARLOS M. 11401 SW 40TH ST STE 460 MIAMI FL 33165 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT
  • 10/28/2019
  • ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rodriguez Hector J
  • 10/25/2019
  • (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
  • 10/23/2019
  • ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rodriguez Hector J
  • 10/23/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520017AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MUNIZ, CARLOS M. 11401 SW 40TH ST STE 460 MIAMI FL 33165 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT
  • 10/16/2019
  • (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
  • 10/12/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510013AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:MUNIZ, CARLOS M. 11401 SW 40TH ST STE 460 MIAMI FL 33165 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECE
  • 10/10/2019
  • Notice of Filing and Serving Administrative Order; Event Type: Event
  • 10/10/2019
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event
  • 10/10/2019
  • Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.