This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/07/2020 at 13:20:47 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, REBECA VS NIEVES, DANIEL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 RODRIGUEZ, REBECA filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against NIEVES, DANIEL. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************H-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Treasure Isle Care Center

Rodriguez, Rebeca

Respondent

Nieves, Daniel

Not Classified By Court

MANUEL ALVAREZ, PHD

BEATRIZ VILLAFANE, MD

JANE ANSLEY, PHD

Prieto, Addys, PHD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Litwin, Avi J

Respondent Attorney

REGIONAL COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Report of General Magistrate; Event Type: Event; Comments: LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Determining Limited Incapacity; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Determination of Capacity; Hearing Code: DC; Hearing Time: 11:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Determination of Capacity; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: RESET FROM 3/25/2020 COVID-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: DR PRIETO - PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRIETO PHD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice and Order Regarding Petition to Determine Incapacity; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: DR ALVAREZ - LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: VILLAFANE, LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: VILLAFANE MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSLEY PHD AND ALAVAEREZ PHD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Formal Notice by Mail; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice and Order Regarding Petition to Determine Incapacity; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450018AMT PAID:$232.00 NAME:LITWIN, AVI J 4434 SHERIDAN AVE MIAMI BEACH FL 33140-3143 COMMENT:CONFIDENTIAL CASE IN ODYSSEY ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3418-MH FILING FEE1$232.00$232.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition to Determine Competency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less