This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/11/2020 at 19:22:30 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, REBECA VS BUEHLER, DALE

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 RODRIGUEZ, REBECA filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against BUEHLER, DALE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************H-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Treasure Isle Care Center

Rodriguez, Rebeca

Respondent

Buehler, Dale

Not Classified By Court

BEATRIZ VILLAFANE, MD

ADDYS PRIETO, PHD

RALPH RICHARDSON, PHD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Litwin, Avi J

Respondent Attorney

REGIONAL COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Report of General Magistrate; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Ordr Determ Inc & Appt Plen Guardian; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Determination of Capacity; Hearing Code: DC; Hearing Time: 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Determination of Capacity; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: RESET FROM 3/25/2020. COVID-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: DR RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: DR VILLAFANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: DR. ADDY'S PRIETO-PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: RICHARDSON, PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: BEATRIZ L. VILLAFANE-LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRIETO PHD AND RICHARDSON PHD AND VILLAFANE MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Formal Notice by Mail; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice and Order Regarding Petition to Determine Incapacity; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450021AMT PAID:$232.00 NAME:LITWIN, AVI J 4434 SHERIDAN AVE MIAMI BEACH FL 33140-3143 COMMENT:CONFIDENTIAL CASE IN ODYSSEY ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3418-MH FILING FEE1$232.00$232.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition to Determine Competency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.