This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/17/2020 at 03:02:39 (UTC).

ROBIN ESCALANTE ET AL VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 ROBIN ESCALANTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Escalante, Franciso

Escalante, Robin

Defendants

Ligman, Steven V

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thaler, Louis

Defendant Attorney

Remy-Estorino, Jennifer

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

10/08/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

10/08/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

10/08/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

10/08/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Production

10/08/2020 - Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/08/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

10/08/2020 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/30/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/30/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/24/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/24/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

09/24/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Remy-Estorino Jennifer; Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Remy-Estorino Jennifer; Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ligman Steven V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660048AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:THALER, LOUIS LOUIS THALER PA 3850 BIRDROAD SUITE 903 CORAL GABLES FL 33146-1431 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2760124AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:THALER, LOUIS LOUIS THALER PA 3850 BIRDROAD SUITE 903 CORAL GABLES FL 33146-1431 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less