This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/25/2023 at 13:58:12 (UTC).

ROBERTO ALAS ZARCENO VS ROCKPOINT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 ROBERTO ALAS ZARCENO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROCKPOINT MANAGEMENT, L L C. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alas Zarceno, Roberto

Defendants

ROCKPOINT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.

ROCKPOINT GROUP, L.L.C.

ROCKHILL MANAGEMENT OPERATIONS, L.L.C.

VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC

MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE SHOPPING CENTER

BRICKELL MAIN STREET LLLP

MB VILLAGE OWNER LLC

U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC.

ALLIED UNIVERSAL

Allied Universal Executive Protection & Intelligen

ALLIED UNIVERSAL RISK ADVISORY CONSULTING SERVICES

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rivero, Alex

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

05/12/2023 - Affidavit of Service

Service Returned

05/09/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/09/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/09/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/09/2023 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/02/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090089AMT PAID:$120.00NAME:RIVERO, ALEX950 S PINE ISLAND RD STE 150APLANTATION FL 33324-3918COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$120.00RECEIPT DATE:05/04/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 18. Parties: PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 17. Parties: ALLIED UNIVERSAL RISK ADVISORY CONSULTING SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Serve Defendant; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120137AMT PAID:$418.50NAME:RIVERO, ALEX950 S PINE ISLAND RD STE 150APLANTATION FL 33324-3918COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$17.50$17.50TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$418.50RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less