Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/04/2021 at 14:01:09 (UTC).

ROBERT SHERMAN VS TIAA FSB ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 ROBERT SHERMAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TIAA FSB. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERMAN, ROBERT

Defendants

EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE INC.

BANK OF FLORIDA

TIAA FSB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wolfe, Richard C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

12/03/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Amended Final Judgment

11/04/2020 - Amended Final Judgment

Final Judgment by Judge

10/30/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/24/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/22/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

09/18/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/18/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RETURN OF SERVICE WITHOUT SUMMON - TIAA FSB DBA TIAA BANK FKA EVERBANK CORPORATION SVC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Final Judgment; Book/Page: 32183:3888; Event Type: Event; Comments: QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 32180:130; Event Type: Event; Comments: QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: TIAA FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2700078AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WOLFE, RICHARD C. 175 SW 7TH ST STE 2410 MIAMI FL 33130-2966 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 REC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2690228AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:WOLFE, RICHARD C. 175 SW 7TH ST STE 2410 MIAMI FL 33130-2966 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS TYGRIS VENDOR FINANCE INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS US EXPRESS LEASING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wolfe, Richard C.