This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/17/2020 at 22:46:02 (UTC).

ROBERT QUINN VS. RAUL DIAZ SENJUDO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 ROBERT QUINN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAUL DIAZ SENJUDO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-24

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quinn, Robert

Defendant

Diaz Senjudo, Raul

Not Classified By Court

Eviction Property Address

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Executed

04/27/2020 - Writ of Possession Returned Executed

Service Returned

01/09/2020 - Service Returned

Order:

12/27/2019 - Order:

Order:

01/02/2020 - Order:

Motion to Stay

01/02/2020 - Motion to Stay

Final Judgment by Judge

12/16/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Motion:

12/23/2019 - Motion:

Writ of Possession Issued

12/20/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment by Judge

12/16/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Default

12/16/2019 - Default

Letter of Correspondence

12/13/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Service Returned

12/13/2019 - Service Returned

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Returned Executed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Senjudo Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Senjudo Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENYING MOTI TO STAY WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Stay; Event Type: Event; Comments: FILED BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MAKE PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION TO MAKE PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS PER DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT SENT TO SHERIFF WITH $115 CHECK Parties: Diaz Senjudo Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31744:6; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Senjudo Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM PLAINTIFF TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Senjudo Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2940001AMT PAID:$3.50 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2143-ADM. & SEAL OATH1$3.50$3.50 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHANGETENDER AMT:($6.50) RECEIPT DATE:12/13/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Senjudo Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Miami Beach; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670002AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$195.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/18/201

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.