This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/11/2022 at 05:14:58 (UTC).

RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC VS VERONICA ROJAS

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VERONICA ROJAS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Riviera Preparatory School Holdings, LLC

Defendant

Rojas, Veronica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Paul Joblove

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/29/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/29/2021 - Complaint

Motion for Extension of Time

05/04/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order:

05/14/2021 - Order:

Order Setting CM Deadline

12/15/2021 - Order Setting CM Deadline

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Case Management Conference; Hearing Code: CMC; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Conference; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060016AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/19/2021REGISTER#:206CASHIER:TCOBB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rojas Veronica

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING PLTFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Richard Paul Joblove; Riviera Preparatory School Holdings LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580296AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:RICHARD PAUL JOBLOVE12372 SW 82ND AVEMIAMI FL 33156-5223COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/30/2021REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less