This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/01/2023 at 02:26:46 (UTC).

RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC. VS PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR MIAMI ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR MIAMI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC.

Defendants

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser for Miami

PETER CAM, as Tax Collector for Miami-Dade County

JIM ZINGALE, Florida Department of Revenue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas H Robertson

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/25/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/25/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Filing:

04/12/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Mediation Conference

03/21/2023 - Notice of Mediation Conference

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/14/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/10/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Production

03/10/2023 - Notice of Production

Response to Request for Production

03/10/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

03/10/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response:

03/09/2023 - Response:

Response:

03/09/2023 - Response:

Notice of Production

03/09/2023 - Notice of Production

Response:

03/09/2023 - Response:

Notice of Filing:

03/08/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Response to Request for Production

03/08/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

03/08/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

03/08/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

02/24/2023 - Request for Admissions

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFSFIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Mediation Conference; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2400002AMT PAID:$30.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE3$10.00$30.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:08/10/2022REGISTER#:240CASHIER:ANDELLW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PETER CAM as Tax Collector for Miami-Dade County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA as Property Appraiser for Miami

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JIM ZINGALE Florida Department of Revenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030109AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:THOMAS H ROBERTSON200 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 850MIAMI FL 33131-5344COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/27/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less