This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/06/2023 at 16:51:53 (UTC).

RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC. VS PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR MIAMI ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR MIAMI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC.

Defendants

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser for Miami

PETER CAM, as Tax Collector for Miami-Dade County

JIM ZINGALE, Florida Department of Revenue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas H Robertson

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/25/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/25/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Hearing-

08/15/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Related Cases

08/11/2023 - Notice of Related Cases

Motion for Extension of Time

07/28/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice:

07/28/2023 - Notice:

Aff In Support of Mtn for Final/summary Judgment

07/18/2023 - Aff In Support of Mtn for Final/summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment

07/17/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment

07/17/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/22/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Witness and Exhibit List

06/12/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Notice of Filing:

06/12/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Witness and Exhibit List

06/12/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/05/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

06/05/2023 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Filing:

04/12/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Mediation Conference

03/21/2023 - Notice of Mediation Conference

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/14/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2024
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH THE NOVEMBER 28, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 01/09/2023 AT 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Aff In Support of Mtn for Final/summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2400002AMT PAID:$30.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE3$10.00$30.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:08/10/2022REGISTER#:240CASHIER:ANDELLW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PETER CAM as Tax Collector for Miami-Dade County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA as Property Appraiser for Miami

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JIM ZINGALE Florida Department of Revenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030109AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:THOMAS H ROBERTSON200 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 850MIAMI FL 33131-5344COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/27/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less