Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/18/2021 at 16:58:14 (UTC).

RIVER RUN SOUTH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. VS CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 RIVER RUN SOUTH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

River Run South Condominium Association, Inc.

Defendant

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bechert, Charles H., III

Defendant Attorney

Matthew L Litsky

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

04/12/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

04/12/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Complaint

03/12/2021 - Complaint

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/17/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Letter of Correspondence

03/12/2021 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/12/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/12/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Production

03/12/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/12/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

03/12/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice:

03/12/2021 - Notice:

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/12/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/16/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620157AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BECHERT, CHARLES H., III 901 E ATLANTIC BLVD POMPANO BEACH FL 33060-7301 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/17/2021 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540139AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BECHERT, CHARLES H., III 901 E ATLANTIC BLVD POMPANO BEACH FL 33060-7301 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/13/2021 REGISTER#:254CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew L Litsky