This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/12/2022 at 05:45:29 (UTC).

RIGHT CHOICE MEDICAL & REHAB CORP., A/A/O EVELYN MARTINEZ VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 RIGHT CHOICE MEDICAL REHAB CORP , A/A/O EVELYN MARTINEZ filed an Other lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

Right Choice Medical & Rehab Corp., a/a/o Evelyn Martinez

Appellee

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

PETERSON, RYAN

Douglas Howard Stein

Appellee Attorney

Nordby, Daniel Elden

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

07/17/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Order:

06/23/2020 - Order:

Motion for Rehearing

06/22/2020 - Motion for Rehearing

Order:

06/19/2020 - Order:

Appeal Invoice

06/11/2020 - Appeal Invoice

Record on Appeal.

06/11/2020 - Record on Appeal.

Response:

05/28/2020 - Response:

Notice:

05/26/2020 - Notice:

Motion for Attorneys Fees

05/19/2020 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Notice of Appearance

05/19/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

03/30/2020 - Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

Notice of Appeal filed

03/20/2020 - Notice of Appeal filed

Appeal Transfer Form

01/08/2021 - Appeal Transfer Form

Motion for Extension of Time for Answer Brief

12/18/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time for Answer Brief

Order:

12/01/2020 - Order:

Estimated Cost Received

10/23/2020 - Estimated Cost Received

Motion for Extension of Time for Answer Brief

10/16/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time for Answer Brief

Granted

10/05/2020 - Granted

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Transfer Form; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record on Appeal Returned to Lower Tribunal; Event Type: Event; Comments: Complete Date: 01/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time for Answer Brief; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE ANSWER BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 20-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Estimated Cost Received; Event Type: Event; Comments: $306.00 Complete Date: 10/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time for Answer Brief; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Granted; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT Complete Date: 10/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: (APPELLANT'S) FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Invoice; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAILED BOTH INVOICES TO APPELLANT'S ATTORNEY TOTAL $306.00 Complete Date: 09/22/2020 Parties: Douglas Howard Stein; PETERSON RYAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Index; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL Complete Date: 09/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Received Record from Lower Court; Event Type: Event; Comments: Complete Date: 06/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR APPELLATE ATTORNEY'S FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PF AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE INITIAL BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event; Comments: COURT FILE Complete Date: 05/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPELLE'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUZANNE Y. LABRIT Complete Date: 05/19/2020 Parties: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record Assigned To; Event Type: Event; Comments: REVENIAS. WITHERSPOON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appeal filed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less