This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/09/2021 at 00:56:04 (UTC).

RICKY DUGGINS VS CYRENA PETA-GAYE MCFARLANE ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 RICKY DUGGINS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CYRENA PETA-GAYE MCFARLANE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duggins, Ricky

Defendants

McFarlane, Cyrena Peta-Gaye

RASIER (FL), LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

 

Court Documents

Objection:

08/22/2021 - Objection:

Notice of Interrogatory

08/19/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/19/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Affidavit of Service

08/18/2021 - Affidavit of Service

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/19/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/19/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/19/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Interrogatory

07/16/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Hearing-

08/24/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Request for Admissions

08/19/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

08/19/2021 - Request for Production

Affidavit of Service

08/17/2021 - Affidavit of Service

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request for Admissions

07/16/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

07/16/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/16/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/16/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT CYRENA PETA-GAYE MCFARLANE'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY AND PROPOSED SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 22, 2021, AT 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Objection:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: McFarlane Cyrena Peta-Gaye

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jorge J Garcia