This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/03/2022 at 21:00:33 (UTC).

REYNA CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC. VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 REYNA CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Reyna Chiropractic Center Inc.

Center, Hammocks Chiropractic

Assignor

Cordoba, Paola

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

Defendant Attorney

Bermudez, Madel

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

08/01/2022 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

08/01/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/01/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

08/01/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

08/01/2022 - Notice of Appearance

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/16/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

09/01/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

09/02/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

09/03/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Appearance

09/22/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/23/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150123AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/18/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150167AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:08/03/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less