This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/22/2021 at 07:02:30 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC. VS WALKIRIA MIRABAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WALKIRIA MIRABAL. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC.

Defendants

MIRABAL, WALKIRIA

MOORS POINTE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

THE MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION, INC.

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

Defendant Attorney

Chadrow, Michael S

 

Court Documents

Answer

08/10/2021 - Answer

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/10/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

07/29/2021 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

07/29/2021 - Complaint

Certificate of Possession of Note

07/29/2021 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

07/29/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/29/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Chadrow Michael S; THE MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Chadrow Michael S; MOORS POINTE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090065AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PL BOCA RATON FL 33487-2853 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/31/2021 REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12. Parties: MIRABAL WALKIRIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: THE MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32663:1754; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant