This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 01:03:44 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC VS CELSO CALLE ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CELSO CALLE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC

Defendants

CELSO, CELSO

LOPEZ RAMOS, MICHEL

LOPEZ, NORAYDA

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE

GARDEN VILLAS CONDOMINIUM I ASSOCIATION INC

CALLE, CELSO

LOPEZ LOPEZ, NORAYDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Certificate of Possession of Note

07/22/2022 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Lis Pendens

07/25/2022 - Lis Pendens

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

07/22/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Complaint

07/22/2022 - Complaint

Answer

08/04/2022 - Answer

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 16. Parties: CALLE CELSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 15. Parties: CALLE CELSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14. Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: LOPEZ RAMOS MICHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33304:3099; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan