This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 07:52:56 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC VS ADA M GUZMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ADA M GUZMAN. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC

Defendants

GUZMAN, ADA M

NAVARRETE, FRANCISCO A

NAVARRETE, JOSE E

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE S

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASUR

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

P & M INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT INC

GONZALEZ, JORGE

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

 

Court Documents

Lis Pendens

05/18/2022 - Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/16/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Certificate

05/16/2022 - Certificate

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/16/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/16/2022 - Complaint

Answer

06/21/2022 - Answer

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/18/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: P & M INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 19. Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 18. Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 16. Parties: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 15. Parties: P & M INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33194:3692; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan