This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/01/2023 at 10:42:43 (UTC).

RESTORATION CLEANING SERVICES, INC. A/A/O DEXTER I VS HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 RESTORATION CLEANING SERVICES, INC A/A/O DEXTER I filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-25

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESTORATION CLEANING SERVICES, INC. a/a/o DEXTER I

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hernandez, Frank, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Louis, Marcus, ESQ

Quintero, Christie L

Edwards, Krystle

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/30/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/30/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

05/11/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Motion to Dismiss

05/11/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hearing-

04/21/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

03/24/2023 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

02/24/2023 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

02/21/2023 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Witness List

01/09/2023 - Witness List

Exhibit List

01/09/2023 - Exhibit List

Motion to Dismiss

10/14/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Attachment and/or Exhibit to Order

09/21/2022 - Attachment and/or Exhibit to Order

Order for Substitution of Counsel

09/21/2022 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Motion for Extension of Time

09/14/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

09/14/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

09/14/2022 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

08/22/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/25/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON THE 23RD DAY OF MAY 2023, AT 9:30 A.M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Attachment and/or Exhibit to Order; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040308AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CANAMERO, JORGE D13145 NW 45TH AVEOPA-LOCKA FL 33054COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/26/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010054AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:CANAMERO, JORGE D13145 NW 45TH AVEOPA-LOCKA FL 33054COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:07/02/2022REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less