This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/21/2021 at 13:28:33 (UTC).

RESPONSIVE AUTO INS CO VS INGRID PEREZ MENDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 RESPONSIVE AUTO INS CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INGRID PEREZ MENDEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Responsive Auto Ins Co

Defendants

Perez Mendez, Ingrid

Perez Mendez, Marvin Aroldo

Not Classified By Court

Calloway, Sparkle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Udine

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

07/15/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

06/23/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/23/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620020AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/26/2021 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:DCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2140025AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/21/2021 REGISTER#:214CASHIER:DCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Perez Mendez Ingrid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2800314AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MICHAEL UDINE 9900 W SAMPLE RD STE 201 CORAL SPRINGS FL 33065-4009 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/24/2021 REGISTER#:280CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $4374.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Udine, Michael I, ESQ.